Geoffrey Myles Goodale | Chair | Washington | 7/1/2024 | 6/30/2027 | COMMITTEE/ITP:66322:4186497 | GOODALE, GEOFFREY |
Melissa Stear Gorsline | Vice Chair | Washington | 7/1/2024 | 6/30/2027 | COMMITTEE/ITP:61448:4186559 | GORSLINE, MELISSA |
Jennifer Kies Mammen | Secretary | Washington | 7/1/2024 | 6/30/2027 | COMMITTEE/ITP:74871:4186557 | MAMMEN, JENNIFER |
Megan Alicia Gajewski Barnhill | Immediate Past Chair | Washington | 7/1/2024 | 6/30/2027 | COMMITTEE/ITP:78368:4234440 | BARNHILL, MEGAN |
Bradley Allen Haneberg | Board of Governors | Richmond | 7/1/2022 | 6/30/2025 | COMMITTEE/ITP:59308:3876771 | HANEBERG, BRADLEY |
Chenxi Lu | Board of Governors | Norfolk | 7/1/2024 | 6/30/2027 | COMMITTEE/ITP:96142:4186592 | LU, CHENXI |
Brian Himanshu Pandya | Board of Governors | Arlington | 7/1/2024 | 6/30/2027 | COMMITTEE/ITP:74050:4186579 | PANDYA, BRIAN |
Tatsiana Yurievna Seliazniova | Board of Governors | Sterling | 7/1/2024 | 6/30/2027 | COMMITTEE/ITP:92794:4186621 | SELIAZNIOVA, TATSIANA |